Senate | 05/05/2025 | Received from the House | ||
House | 05/02/2025 | Reported engrossed | ||
House | 05/02/2025 | Record vote | RV#1335 | Journal Page: 2717 |
House | 05/02/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 2717 | |
House | 05/02/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2717 | |
House | 05/01/2025 | Record vote | RV#1240 | Journal Page: 2608 |
House | 05/01/2025 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 2608 | |
House | 05/01/2025 | Record vote RV#1240 | ||
House | 05/01/2025 | Point of order withdrawn | Rule 4, Section 32(c) | Journal Page: 2607 |
House | 05/01/2025 | Amended | 1-Phelan | |
House | 05/01/2025 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2607 | |
House | 05/01/2025 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/28/2025 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/25/2025 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/23/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/23/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1838 | |
House | 04/16/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/16/2025 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/14/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/14/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/14/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/14/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/03/2025 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 960 | |
House | 04/03/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 960 | |
House | 03/13/2025 | Filed |