Senate | 04/29/2025 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1587 | |
House | 04/29/2025 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2464 | |
House | 04/29/2025 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2058 | |
House | 04/29/2025 | Record vote | RV#721 | Journal Page: 2057 |
House | 04/29/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 2057 | |
House | 04/29/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2057 | |
House | 04/28/2025 | Record vote | RV#611 | Journal Page: 1934 |
House | 04/28/2025 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 1934 | |
House | 04/28/2025 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1934 | |
House | 04/28/2025 | Amended | 1-M. Gonzlez | |
House | 04/28/2025 | Point of order overruled | ||
House | 04/28/2025 | Point of order withdrawn | Rule 8, Section 1 | Journal Page: 1931 |
House | 04/28/2025 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1931 | |
House | 04/25/2025 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/22/2025 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/15/2025 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/14/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/14/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 04/07/2025 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/07/2025 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/07/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/17/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/17/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/17/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/17/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/28/2025 | Referred to Public Health | Journal Page: 357 | |
House | 02/28/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 357 | |
House | 11/12/2024 | Filed |