Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Failed to receive affirmative vote in comm.
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Reported engrossed: May 2 2025 1:16PM
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Last Action: 04/17/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Last Action: 04/17/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Reported engrossed: May 2 2025 1:47PM
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Reported engrossed: May 2 2025 2:18PM
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Reported engrossed: May 2 2025 1:16PM
Last Action: 04/16/2025 H Withdrawn from schedule