LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2025 - 89th Regular
House
Bills
HB5083
Meeting Schedule
TX
Texas House Bill HB5083
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2025 - 89th Regular
Texas House Bill HB5083
Meeting Schedule
Calendar
Date
Event
Location
04/23/2025
10:30 am
Delivery of Government Efficiency Committee Meeting - Video Transcripts, Minutes, and Details
E2.010
HB565
Introduced
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
HB3743
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
HB4310
Introduced
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
HB5083
Introduced
Last Action: 04/23/2025 H Left pending in committee
HB5129
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
HB5195
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
HB5331
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
HB5469
Introduced
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
SB21
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/23/2025 H Left pending in committee
HB3185
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
04/23/2025
10:30 am
Delivery of Government Efficiency Committee Meeting - Video Transcripts, Minutes, and Details
E2.010
HB565
Introduced
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
HB3743
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
HB4310
Introduced
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
HB5083
Introduced
Last Action: 04/23/2025 H Left pending in committee
HB5129
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
HB5195
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
HB5331
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
HB5469
Introduced
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
SB21
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/23/2025 H Left pending in committee
HB3185
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars