Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas House Bill HB5098 Meeting Schedule

Calendar

Date
Event
Location
04/28/2025 8:00 am
Introduced
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Introduced
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Left pending in committee
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/10/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/09/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Introduced
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/10/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/10/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/08/2025 H Committee report distributed: May 8 2025 8:19PM
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/08/2025 H Committee report distributed: May 8 2025 10:44PM
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/08/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/10/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Introduced
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
Introduced
Last Action: 05/08/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/10/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Introduced
Last Action: 05/08/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/08/2025 H Committee report distributed: May 8 2025 5:15PM
Introduced
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 05/08/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/08/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/08/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Introduced
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Left pending in committee
04/28/2025 8:00 am
Introduced
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Introduced
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Left pending in committee
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/10/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/09/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Introduced
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/10/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/10/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/08/2025 H Committee report distributed: May 8 2025 8:19PM
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/08/2025 H Committee report distributed: May 8 2025 10:44PM
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/08/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/10/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Introduced
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
Introduced
Last Action: 05/08/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/10/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Introduced
Last Action: 05/08/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/08/2025 H Committee report distributed: May 8 2025 5:15PM
Introduced
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 05/08/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/08/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/08/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Introduced
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Left pending in committee