House | 04/29/2025 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/28/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/28/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 04/23/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/23/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/07/2025 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 984 | |
House | 04/07/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 984 | |
House | 03/13/2025 | Filed |