Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas House Bill HB5183 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 03/18/2025

                            By: Frank H.B. No. 5183


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to contracts with managed care organizations, including
 the procurement of managed care contracts, under Medicaid and the
 child health plan program.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter E, Chapter 540, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Sections 540.02041, 540.02042, and
 540.02043533.0038 to read as follows:
 Sec. 540.02041.  DURATION OF CONTRACTS. (a)  Contracts the
 commission signs with managed care organizations do not have a set
 term length.
 (b)  A contract the commission signs with a managed care
 organization shall not be terminated except through the process
 described in Sec. 540.02042(h) and (i) or upon the request of the
 managed care organization.
 Sec. 540.02042.  PERFORMANCE MEASURES. (a)  The programs to
 which this section applies include STAR, STAR Kids, STAR + Plus, and
 the child health plan program.
 (b)  The commission shall adopt and publish clear and
 comprehensive measures by which the quality and performance of
 managed care organizations will be measured.
 (c)  In adopting the measures under Subsection (a), the
 commission shall consider:
 (1)  cost efficiency, quality of care, experience of
 care, and member and provider satisfaction;
 (2)  the size and quality of a managed care
 organization's provider network; and
 (3)  past experience of the managed care organization
 in providing similar services in this or other states.
 (d)  The measures shall include:
 (1)  outcome-based performance measures described by
 Section 533.0051;
 (2)  the most recent results from the Agency for
 Healthcare Research and Quality's Consumer Assessment of
 Healthcare Providers and Systems (CAHPS) Health Plan Survey; and
 (3)  Healthcare Effectiveness Data and Information Set
 (HEDIS) measurement results.
 (e)  The commission may adopt measures only after a public
 hearing and comment process that considers proposed measures.
 (f)  A managed care organization is responsible for
 providing the commission with data necessary for the commission to
 determine whether the applicant has met the qualifying criteria.
 (g)  The commission shall:
 (1)  monthly evaluate a managed care organization
 performance and quality by region; and
 (2)  post on its Internet website the results of the
 monthly evaluations conducted under this section in a format that
 is readily accessible to and understandable by a member of the
 public.
 (h)  If a managed care organization that has contracted with
 the commission under this section fails to comply with the terms of
 its contract and the commission determines the managed care
 organization has not made substantial efforts to mitigate or remedy
 the noncompliance, or if its results on the measurements described
 in subsection (b) are in the bottom quartile of all plans operating
 in the state in the same program, or if their results on the
 measurements described in subsection (b) are the lowest in the
 region, the commissioner shall pursue the following remedies in
 addition to any remedies available to the commission under the
 contract, in this order:
 (1)  require submission of and compliance with a
 corrective action plan;
 (2)  seek recovery of actual damages or liquidated
 damages specified in the contract;
 (3)  suspend default enrollment of recipients to the
 managed care organization in one or more regions; and
 (4)  terminate the contract.
 (i)  If the commission has taken remedies described in
 (h)(1), (h)(2), and (h)(3), and the plan has not shown significant
 improvement over 18 months, then the commission shall take the
 action described by (h)(4).
 Sec. 540.02043.  LIMITS ON MANAGED CARE ORGANIZATIONS. (a)
 The commission shall limit the number of managed care organizations
 operating in each Medicaid program in each region.
 (b) In each Medicaid program, the commission may limit the
 number of regions in which a managed care organization may operate.
 SECTION 3.  Section 62.002, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended by adding Subsection (5) to read as follows:
 (5)  "Region" means a service area delineated by the
 commission.
 SECTION 4.  Section 62.155, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended by amending Subsection (a) and adding Subsections (e) and
 (f) to read as follows:
 (a)  Following the termination of a health plan provider's
 contract in a region, the commission may select a health plan
 provider to operate in that region [The commission shall select the
 health plan providers] under the program through a competitive
 procurement process.  A health plan provider, other than a state
 administered primary care case management network, must hold a
 certificate of authority or other appropriate license issued by the
 Texas Department of Insurance that authorizes the health plan
 provider to provide the type of child health plan offered and must
 satisfy, except as provided by this chapter, any applicable
 requirement of the Insurance Code or another insurance law of this
 state.
 (e)  The commission shall limit the number of health plan
 providers operating under the program in each region of the state.
 (f)  The commission may limit the number of regions in which
 a health plan provider may operate under the program.
 (g)  Contracts the commission signs with health plan
 providers do not have a set term length.
 (h)  A contract the commission signs with a managed care
 organization shall not be terminated except through the process
 described in Sec. 540.02042(h) and (i) or upon the request of the
 health plan provider.
 SECTION 5.  Section 540.0204, Government Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 540.0204.  CONTRACT CONSIDERATIONS RELATING TO MANAGED
 CARE ORGANIZATIONS. Following the termination of a managed care
 organization's contract, [I]in awarding a contract[s] to a managed
 care organization[s] in that region, the commission shall:
 (1)  give preference to an organization that has significant
 participation in the organization's provider network from each
 health care provider in the region who has traditionally provided
 care to Medicaid and charity care patients;
 (2)  give extra consideration to an organization that agrees
 to assure continuity of care for at least three months beyond a
 recipient's Medicaid eligibility period;
 (3)  consider the need to use different managed care plans to
 meet the needs of different populations; and
 (4)  consider the ability of an organization to process
 Medicaid claims electronically.
 SECTION 6.  (a) The Health and Human Services Commission
 shall enter into contracts with the managed care organizations that
 had contracts in effect as of January 1, 2025 for the STAR, CHIP,
 and STAR Kids programs.  These contracts shall be subject to
 Sections 540.0204, 540.02041, and 540.02042 of the Government Code
 and Section 62.155 of the Health and Safety Code.  The commission
 shall cancel all procurements for the STAR, CHIP, or STAR Kids
 programs that were pending as of January 1, 2025.
 (b)  As specified in the notice of intent to award, the
 commission shall enter into contracts with managed care
 organizations that are awardees designated in the notice of intent
 to award of any pending procurements.  These contracts shall be
 subject to Sections 540.0204, 540.02041, and 540.02042 of the
 Government Code and Section 62.155 of the Health and Safety Code.
 (c)  By January 1, 2030, the Health and Human Services
 Commission shall have entered into contracts with the managed care
 organizations for the Star + Plus program that had contracts in
 effect as of January 1, 2029 for the Star + Plus program.  These
 contracts shall be subject to Sections 540.0204, 540.02041, and
 540.02042 of the Government Code and Section 62.155 of the Health
 and Safety Code.
 (d)  A Medicaid recipient or child health plan program
 participant enrolled in a managed care plan with a contract
 described by Subsection (a) shall continue enrollment in the
 managed care plan until the recipient or participant chooses to be
 enrolled in a different managed care plan, is no longer eligible for
 services, or is enrolled in a plan subject to contract termination
 in the region in which the recipient or participant resides.
 SECTION 7.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2025.