LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2025 - 89th Regular
House
Bills
HB5187
Meeting Schedule
TX
Texas House Bill HB5187
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2025 - 89th Regular
Texas House Bill HB5187
Meeting Schedule
Calendar
Date
Event
Location
04/24/2025
8:00 am
Land & Resource Management Committee Meeting - Video Transcripts, Minutes, and Details
E2.026
SB840
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
HB2025
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/08/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
HB2512
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Committee report distributed: May 7 2025 8:50PM
HB3139
Introduced
Last Action: 04/24/2025 H Left pending in committee
HB3798
Introduced
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
HB3892
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Postponed
HB4373
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Postponed
HB4398
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
HB4582
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/09/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
HB4689
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Postponed
HB5187
Introduced
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
HB5658
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Reported engrossed: May 7 2025 3:22PM
HB5666
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Reported engrossed: May 7 2025 2:21PM
04/24/2025
8:00 am
Land & Resource Management Committee Meeting - Video Transcripts, Minutes, and Details
E2.026
SB840
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
HB2025
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/08/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
HB2512
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Committee report distributed: May 7 2025 8:50PM
HB3139
Introduced
Last Action: 04/24/2025 H Left pending in committee
HB3798
Introduced
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
HB3892
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Postponed
HB4373
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Postponed
HB4398
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
HB4582
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/09/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
HB4689
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Postponed
HB5187
Introduced
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
HB5658
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Reported engrossed: May 7 2025 3:22PM
HB5666
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Reported engrossed: May 7 2025 2:21PM