LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2025 - 89th Regular
House
Bills
HB5256
Meeting Schedule
TX
Texas House Bill HB5256
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2025 - 89th Regular
Texas House Bill HB5256
Meeting Schedule
Calendar
Date
Event
Location
04/24/2025
10:30 am
Elections
E2.012
HB2442
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/10/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
HB3697
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/08/2025 H Reported engrossed: May 8 2025 5:47PM
HB4288
Introduced
Last Action: 05/08/2025 H Failed to receive affirmative vote in comm.
HB5256
Introduced
Last Action: 05/08/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
HB5337
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
HB5362
Introduced
Last Action: 05/08/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
HJR161
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/08/2025 H Placed on Constitutional Amendments Calendar
04/24/2025
10:30 am
Elections
E2.012
HB2442
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/10/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
HB3697
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/08/2025 H Reported engrossed: May 8 2025 5:47PM
HB4288
Introduced
Last Action: 05/08/2025 H Failed to receive affirmative vote in comm.
HB5256
Introduced
Last Action: 05/08/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
HB5337
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
HB5362
Introduced
Last Action: 05/08/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
HJR161
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/08/2025 H Placed on Constitutional Amendments Calendar