Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas House Bill HB5269 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 14, 2025
Fiscal Note March 14, 2025

House Committee Report

Bill April 30, 2025
Fiscal Note April 30, 2025
Analysis April 30, 2025
Witness List April 30, 2025

Comm Sub

Bill April 30, 2025

Analysis

Analysis April 29, 2025

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 24, 2025
Fiscal Note April 21, 2025