Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas House Bill HB5352 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 03/14/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            89R6316 PRL-F
 By: Bucy H.B. No. 5352




 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the establishment of the State Blockchain Technology
 Pilot Program by the Department of Information Resources.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 2054, Government Code, is amended by
 adding Subchapter T to read as follows:
 SUBCHAPTER T. STATE BLOCKCHAIN TECHNOLOGY PILOT PROGRAM
 Sec. 2054.701.  DEFINITIONS. In this subchapter:
 (1)  "Blockchain" means a distributed ledger
 technology that records transactions in a verifiable and immutable
 manner, shared across multiple nodes in a network, ensuring
 transparency and security.
 (2)  "Program" means the State Blockchain Technology
 Pilot Program established under Section 2054.702.
 (3)  "Program participant" means the state agency
 selected by the governor to participate in the program under
 Section 2054.703.
 Sec. 2054.702.  ESTABLISHMENT OF PROGRAM. (a) The board
 shall establish a pilot program to explore the application and
 benefits of the use of blockchain technology by the program
 participant for the purpose of improving transparency, security,
 and efficiency in government operations.
 (b)  The program shall study the use of blockchain by the
 program participant:
 (1)  to streamline the secure storage and retrieval of
 records and documents;
 (2)  to improve the transparency of procurement
 processes and tracking of goods or services utilized by the program
 participant;
 (3)  to test secure methods for identity verification
 of:
 (A)  employees of the program participant;
 (B)  contractors of the program participant; and
 (C)  citizens that interact with the program
 participant;
 (4)  to enhance mechanisms for fraud detection and
 prevention; and
 (5)  for any other application to improve public
 services or administrative efficiency, as determined by the program
 participant, the governor, or the department.
 (c)  In administering the program, the department shall
 ensure compliance with cybersecurity and privacy measures.
 Sec. 2054.703.  SELECTION OF PROGRAM PARTICIPANT. (a) The
 governor shall select a state agency to serve as the program
 participant.
 (b)  The board shall provide the governor with
 recommendations on the selection of the program participant based
 on:
 (1)  the feasibility of implementing the program by the
 program participant;
 (2)  the budget appropriated by the legislature to the
 department for the program;
 (3)  the anticipated disruption to existing services of
 the program participant;
 (4)  the anticipated efficacy of the program on
 existing services of the program participant; and
 (5)  cybersecurity and confidentiality concerns.
 Sec. 2054.704.  REPORT. (a) Not later than January 1, 2029,
 the department shall submit to the governor, lieutenant governor,
 and members of the legislature a report documenting the outcomes of
 the program. The report must include:
 (1)  an evaluation of the benefits and challenges of
 implementing blockchain technology in the program participant's
 operations;
 (2)  an assessment of the cost-effectiveness of the
 blockchain solution compared to existing systems of the program
 participant;
 (3)  a determination of feasibility on whether
 blockchain should be expanded to other state agencies or
 operations; and
 (4)  any identified risks, security concerns, or
 regulatory barriers encountered during the program.
 (b)  The department may contract with a private entity to
 prepare the report required under this section.
 Sec. 2054.705.  COLLABORATION. (a) For the purposes of
 satisfying the requirements of Section 2054.702, the department
 shall collaborate with a state university that operates:
 (1)  a statewide technology center for data established
 under Section 2054.382; and
 (2)  a regional network security center established
 under Section 2059.202.
 (b)  The department may collaborate or contract with private
 technology firms or consultants for technical expertise or
 assistance in implementing the program.
 Sec. 2054.706.  FUNDING. (a) Funding for the program
 consists of:
 (1)  money appropriated by the legislature for the
 purposes of the program;
 (2)  gifts, grants, and donations received under
 Subsection (c); and
 (3)  any other money available for the purposes of the
 program.
 (b)  If the amount available under Subsection (a) is less
 than the costs to administer the program, the governor and the
 Legislative Budget Board may transfer or repurpose money under a
 proposal under Chapter 317 to provide additional funding to
 administer the program.
 (c)  The department may solicit and accept gifts, grants, and
 donations from any public or private source.
 (d)  Not later than January 1, 2029, the department shall
 transfer all unspent funds to the general revenue fund.
 Sec. 2054.707.  RULES. The department shall adopt rules
 necessary to administer the pilot program.
 Sec. 2054.708.  EXPIRATION. This subchapter expires
 September 1, 2029.
 SECTION 2.  (a) Not later than December 1, 2025, the
 Department of Information Resources shall adopt rules necessary to
 implement and administer the State Blockchain Technology Pilot
 Program established under Section 2054.702, Government Code, as
 added by this Act.
 (b)  As soon as practicable after the effective date of this
 Act, the Department of Information Resources shall prepare and
 submit the list of recommended state agencies required by Section
 2054.703, Government Code, as added by this Act.
 (c)  Not later than 15 business days after receiving the list
 of recommended state agencies, the governor shall select a state
 agency to participate in the State Blockchain Technology Pilot
 Program as required by Section 2054.703, Government Code, as added
 by this Act.
 SECTION 3.  It is the intent of the legislature that every
 provision, section, subsection, sentence, clause, phrase, or word
 in this Act, and every application of the provisions in this Act to
 every person, group of persons, or circumstances, is severable from
 each other. If any application of any provision in this Act to any
 person, group of persons, or circumstances is found by a court to be
 invalid for any reason, the remaining applications of that
 provision to all other persons and circumstances shall be severed
 and may not be affected.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2025.