Senate | 04/23/2025 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1423 | |
House | 04/23/2025 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1838 | |
House | 04/23/2025 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1691 | |
House | 04/23/2025 | Record vote | RV#408 | Journal Page: 1690 |
House | 04/23/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 1690 | |
House | 04/23/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1690 | |
House | 04/22/2025 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1640 | |
House | 04/22/2025 | Record vote | RV#360 | Journal Page: 1639 |
House | 04/22/2025 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 1639 | |
House | 04/22/2025 | Record vote RV#360 | ||
House | 04/22/2025 | Record vote RV#359 | ||
House | 04/22/2025 | Amended | 1-Bernal | Journal Page: 1626 |
House | 04/22/2025 | Amended 1-Bernal | ||
House | 04/22/2025 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1630 | |
House | 04/22/2025 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/17/2025 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/15/2025 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/14/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/14/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1410 | |
House | 04/08/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/08/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/25/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/25/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/25/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/25/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/03/2025 | Referred to Higher Education | Journal Page: 361 | |
House | 03/03/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 361 | |
House | 11/12/2024 | Filed |