House | 05/08/2025 | Reported engrossed | ||
House | 05/08/2025 | Record vote | RV#1796 | |
House | 05/08/2025 | Passed | ||
House | 05/08/2025 | Read 3rd time | ||
House | 05/07/2025 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3211 | |
House | 05/07/2025 | Record vote | RV#1685 | Journal Page: 3210 |
House | 05/07/2025 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 3203 | |
House | 05/07/2025 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 3204 | |
House | 05/07/2025 | Postponed | 5/7/25 4:00 PM | Journal Page: 3192 |
House | 05/07/2025 | Read 2nd time | ||
House | 05/07/2025 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/05/2025 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/01/2025 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/30/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/30/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2690 | |
House | 04/24/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/24/2025 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/31/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/31/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/31/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/31/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/03/2025 | Referred to Public Health | Journal Page: 361 | |
House | 03/03/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 361 | |
House | 11/12/2024 | Filed |