Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas House Bill HB5437 Meeting Schedule

Calendar

Date
Event
Location
05/07/2025
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/08/2025 S Reported enrolled
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/08/2025 S Reported enrolled
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/08/2025 S Reported enrolled
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/08/2025 S Referred to Transportation
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Laid on the table subject to call
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/10/2025 H Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/08/2025 S Referred to Health & Human Services
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/08/2025 S Received from the House
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/08/2025 S Referred to Health & Human Services
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/08/2025 S Received from the House
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/08/2025 S Received from the House
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/08/2025 S Received from the House
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/08/2025 S Received from the House
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/08/2025 S Referred to Criminal Justice
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/08/2025 S Received from the House
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/08/2025 S Received from the House
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/08/2025 S Referred to Business & Commerce
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/08/2025 S Referred to Transportation
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/08/2025 S Received from the House
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/08/2025 S Received from the House
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/08/2025 S Referred to Natural Resources
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/08/2025 S Referred to Finance
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/08/2025 S Received from the House
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/12/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/08/2025 S Received from the House
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/08/2025 S Referred to Criminal Justice
Introduced
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Laid on the table subject to call
Introduced
Last Action: 05/08/2025 S Referred to Administration
04/17/2025 8:00 am
Introduced
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Laid out as postponed business
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/08/2025 H Committee report distributed: May 8 2025 4:43PM
Introduced
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
Introduced
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/08/2025 H Postponed
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/08/2025 S Referred to Local Government
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/08/2025 S Received from the House
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/08/2025 S Received from the House
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/08/2025 S Received from the House
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/08/2025 S Received from the House
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/08/2025 S Received from the House
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/08/2025 S Received from the House
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/08/2025 S Received from the House
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/08/2025 S Received from the House
04/17/2025 8:00 am
Introduced
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Laid out as postponed business
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/08/2025 H Committee report distributed: May 8 2025 4:43PM
Introduced
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
Introduced
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/08/2025 H Postponed
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/08/2025 S Referred to Local Government
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/08/2025 S Received from the House
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/08/2025 S Received from the House
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/08/2025 S Received from the House
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/08/2025 S Received from the House
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/08/2025 S Received from the House
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/08/2025 S Received from the House
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/08/2025 S Received from the House
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/08/2025 S Received from the House