House | 05/01/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 05/01/2025 | Failed to receive affirmative vote in comm. | ||
House | 05/01/2025 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/01/2025 | Recalled from subcommittee | ||
House | 04/14/2025 | Left pending in subcommittee | ||
House | 04/14/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee | ||
House | 04/14/2025 | Considered by s/c in public hearing | ||
House | 04/14/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . | ||
House | 04/10/2025 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 1134 | |
House | 04/07/2025 | Referred to s/c on Juvenile Justice by Speaker | Journal Page: 1015 | |
House | 04/07/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1015 | |
House | 03/14/2025 | Filed |