Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas House Bill HB5506 Meeting Schedule

Calendar

Date
Event
Location
04/15/2025 10:30 am
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Introduced
Last Action: 04/22/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Committee report distributed: May 2 2025 1:49PM
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Introduced
Last Action: 04/22/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Introduced
Last Action: 04/22/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
Introduced
Last Action: 04/22/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Committee report distributed: May 2 2025 11:12AM
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Committee report distributed: May 2 2025 11:12AM
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Introduced
Last Action: 04/22/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Introduced
Last Action: 04/22/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Introduced
Last Action: 04/22/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
04/15/2025 10:30 am
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Introduced
Last Action: 04/22/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Committee report distributed: May 2 2025 1:49PM
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Introduced
Last Action: 04/22/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Introduced
Last Action: 04/22/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
Introduced
Last Action: 04/22/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Committee report distributed: May 2 2025 11:12AM
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Committee report distributed: May 2 2025 11:12AM
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Introduced
Last Action: 04/22/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Introduced
Last Action: 04/22/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Introduced
Last Action: 04/22/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)