Senate | 04/30/2025 | Received from the House | ||
House | 04/30/2025 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2648 | |
House | 04/30/2025 | Record vote | RV#980 | |
House | 04/30/2025 | Passed | ||
House | 04/30/2025 | Read 3rd time | ||
House | 04/29/2025 | Record vote | RV#833 | Journal Page: 2161 |
House | 04/29/2025 | Passed to engrossment | ||
House | 04/29/2025 | Record vote RV#833 | ||
House | 04/29/2025 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2160 | |
House | 04/29/2025 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/24/2025 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/22/2025 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/17/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/17/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1653 | |
House | 04/09/2025 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/03/2025 | Reported from s/c favorably with substitute | ||
House | 04/03/2025 | Committee substitute considered in s/c | ||
House | 04/03/2025 | Considered by s/c in public hearing | ||
House | 03/20/2025 | Left pending in subcommittee | ||
House | 03/20/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee | ||
House | 03/20/2025 | Committee substitute considered in s/c | ||
House | 03/20/2025 | Considered by s/c in public hearing | ||
House | 03/20/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . | ||
House | 03/03/2025 | Referred to s/c on Property Tax Appraisals by Speaker | Journal Page: 362 | |
House | 03/03/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 362 | |
House | 11/12/2024 | Filed |