House | 04/07/2025 | Referred to Natural Resources | Journal Page: 1028 | |
House | 04/07/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1028 | |
House | 03/26/2025 | Recommendations filed with the Speaker | ||
House | 03/21/2025 | Recommendations filed with the Speaker | ||
House | 03/19/2025 | Transmitted to the Governor | ||
House | 03/18/2025 | Filed | ||
House | 03/18/2025 | Record vote | ||
House | 03/18/2025 | Permission to introduce |