Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas House Bill HB5654 Meeting Schedule

Calendar

Date
Event
Location
05/07/2025
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
Introduced
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
Introduced
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
04/17/2025 8:00 am
Introduced
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Introduced
Last Action: 04/24/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Introduced
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Introduced
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Introduced
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
04/17/2025 8:00 am
Introduced
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Introduced
Last Action: 04/24/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Introduced
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Introduced
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Introduced
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar