House | 04/30/2025 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/29/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/29/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2464 | |
House | 04/24/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/24/2025 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/24/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/24/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/24/2025 | Recommendations filed with the Speaker | Journal Page: 1905 | |
House | 04/24/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/07/2025 | Referred to Land & Resource Management | Journal Page: 1029 | |
House | 04/07/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1029 | |
House | 03/28/2025 | Transmitted to the Governor | ||
House | 03/28/2025 | Filed |