House | 05/02/2025 | Laid on the table subject to call | Journal Page: 2745 | |
House | 05/02/2025 | Companion considered in lieu of | SB 2964 | Journal Page: 2745 |
House | 04/29/2025 | Postponed | 5/2/25 9:00 AM | Journal Page: 2208 |
House | 04/29/2025 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2208 | |
House | 04/29/2025 | Postponed 5/2/25 9:00 AM | ||
House | 04/29/2025 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/25/2025 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/25/2025 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/25/2025 | Transferred to Calendars Committee | ||
House | 04/25/2025 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/23/2025 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/22/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/22/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1740 | |
House | 04/14/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/14/2025 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/14/2025 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/03/2025 | Referred to Elections | Journal Page: 364 | |
House | 03/03/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 364 | |
House | 11/12/2024 | Filed |