Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas House Bill HB614 Meeting Schedule

Calendar

Date
Event
Location
03/20/2025 10:30 am
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Considered in Calendars
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/17/2025 H Considered in Calendars
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/17/2025 H Considered in Calendars
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Considered in Calendars
Introduced
Last Action: 03/20/2025 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 03/20/2025 H Left pending in committee
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/17/2025 H Considered in Calendars
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Considered in Calendars