Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas House Bill HB644 Meeting Schedule

Calendar

Date
Event
Location
03/12/2025 8:00 am
Introduced
Last Action: 04/08/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Laid on the table subject to call
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/29/2025 S Referred to Criminal Justice
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S Referred to Criminal Justice
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Considered in Calendars
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/29/2025 S Referred to Criminal Justice
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Reported engrossed: May 1 2025 1:21PM
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/29/2025 S Referred to Jurisprudence
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/24/2025 S Referred to Finance
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S Received from the House