LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2025 - 89th Regular
House
Bills
HB673
Meeting Schedule
TX
Texas House Bill HB673
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2025 - 89th Regular
Texas House Bill HB673
Meeting Schedule
Calendar
Date
Event
Location
03/25/2025
8:00 am
S/C on Workforce
E2.012
HB322
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Referred to Education K-16
HB331
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 05/08/2025 S Co-sponsor authorized
HB673
Introduced
Last Action: 03/25/2025 H Left pending in subcommittee
HB1147
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/23/2025 S Received from the House
HB1154
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/23/2025 S Received from the House
HB2488
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/24/2025 S Referred to Business & Commerce