Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas House Bill HB674 Meeting Schedule

Calendar

Date
Event
Location
03/12/2025 10:30 am
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/17/2025 H Considered in Calendars
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/09/2025 H Considered in Calendars
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/14/2025 S Referred to Transportation
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Referred to Criminal Justice
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/07/2025 S Referred to State Affairs
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/09/2025 H Considered in Calendars
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/03/2025 S Referred to Criminal Justice