Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas House Bill HB679 Meeting Schedule

Calendar

Date
Event
Location
04/08/2025 10:30 am
Introduced
Last Action: 04/08/2025 H Left pending in committee
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Laid on the table subject to call
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Received from the House
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Introduced
Last Action: 04/15/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
Introduced
Last Action: 04/08/2025 H Left pending in committee
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Referred to State Affairs
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/22/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Referred to Business & Commerce
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Laid on the table subject to call
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Laid on the table subject to call
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Referred to Criminal Justice
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Received from the House
Introduced
Last Action: 04/08/2025 H Left pending in committee