Senate | 05/05/2025 | Referred to Business & Commerce | ||
Senate | 05/05/2025 | Received from the House | ||
Senate | 05/05/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 386 | |
House | 05/01/2025 | Reported engrossed | ||
House | 05/01/2025 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2426 | |
House | 05/01/2025 | Record vote | RV#1132 | Journal Page: 2488 |
House | 05/01/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 2488 | |
House | 05/01/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2488 | |
House | 04/30/2025 | Record vote | RV#1091 | Journal Page: 2426 |
House | 04/30/2025 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 2425 | |
House | 04/30/2025 | Record vote RV#1091 | ||
House | 04/30/2025 | Amended | 1-Wilson | Journal Page: 2405 |
House | 04/30/2025 | Read 2nd time | ||
House | 04/30/2025 | Amended 1-Wilson | ||
House | 04/30/2025 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/28/2025 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/17/2025 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/16/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/16/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1579 | |
House | 04/08/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/08/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/01/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/01/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/01/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/01/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/04/2025 | Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures | Journal Page: 386 | |
House | 11/12/2024 | Filed |