Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas House Bill HB740 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 11/12/2024

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            89R888 SCP-F
 By: Walle H.B. No. 740




 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the eligibility of certain students enrolled in a
 postsecondary educational institution for supplemental nutrition
 assistance program benefits.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter A, Chapter 33, Human Resources Code,
 is amended by adding Section 33.020 to read as follows:
 Sec. 33.020.  SNAP ELIGIBILITY OF CERTAIN STUDENTS ENROLLED
 IN POSTSECONDARY EDUCATION PROGRAMS. (a) In this section,
 "postsecondary educational institution" includes:
 (1)  an institution of higher education or a private or
 independent institution of higher education, as those terms are
 defined by Section 61.003, Education Code; and
 (2)  a career school or college, as defined by Section
 132.001, Education Code.
 (b)  The executive commissioner shall adopt rules consistent
 with federal law to provide supplemental nutrition assistance
 program benefits to students enrolled in a postsecondary
 educational institution. The rules must:
 (1)  identify the types of postsecondary degrees or
 programs in which a student must be enrolled to qualify for the
 benefits, including participation in any work placement or unpaid
 internship associated with a postsecondary educational
 institution; and
 (2)  ensure a student remains eligible for the benefits
 during a break in the semester or academic term of the postsecondary
 educational institution in which the student is enrolled.
 (c)  The executive commissioner shall establish a work group
 to provide input for the adoption of rules under Subsection (b). In
 adopting the rules, the executive commissioner shall consider the
 work group's input.
 (d)  The work group must be composed of at least 9 but not
 more than 13 members who are representatives of:
 (1)  postsecondary educational institutions; or
 (2)  nonprofit organizations that serve low-income
 individuals, as defined by the executive commissioner.
 (e)  The executive commissioner shall:
 (1)  ensure work group members represent various types
 of postsecondary educational institutions located throughout this
 state; and
 (2)  appoint one work group member to serve as
 presiding officer.
 (f)  The work group is automatically abolished on the
 adoption of rules under Subsection (b).
 (g)  Subsections (c), (d), (e), and (f) and this subsection
 expire September 1, 2027.
 SECTION 2.  (a)  Not later than December 31, 2025, the
 executive commissioner of the Health and Human Services Commission
 shall establish the work group required by Section 33.020, Human
 Resources Code, as added by this Act.
 (b)  Not later than December 31, 2026, the executive
 commissioner of the Health and Human Services Commission shall
 adopt the rules required by Section 33.020, Human Resources Code,
 as added by this Act.
 SECTION 3.  If before implementing any provision of this Act
 a state agency determines that a waiver or authorization from a
 federal agency is necessary for implementation of that provision,
 the agency affected by the provision shall request the waiver or
 authorization and may delay implementing that provision until the
 waiver or authorization is granted.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2025.