Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas House Bill HB748 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note November 26, 2024
Bill November 12, 2024

House Committee Report

Witness List March 25, 2025
Analysis March 25, 2025
Fiscal Note March 25, 2025
Bill March 25, 2025

Engrossed

Bill April 9, 2025

Comm Sub

Bill March 25, 2025

Analysis

Analysis March 24, 2025

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note March 21, 2025
Fiscal Note March 16, 2025