Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas House Bill HB816 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 11/12/2024

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            89R2173 BEE-D
 By: Jones of Harris H.B. No. 816




 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the licensing and regulation of youth sports programs;
 providing civil and administrative penalties; authorizing fees.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subtitle B, Title 13, Occupations Code, is
 amended by adding Chapter 2053 to read as follows:
 CHAPTER 2053. YOUTH SPORTS PROGRAMS
 SUBCHAPTER A. GENERAL PROVISIONS
 Sec. 2053.001.  DEFINITIONS. In this chapter:
 (1)  "Advisory board" means the youth sports program
 advisory board.
 (2)  "Commission" means the Texas Commission of
 Licensing and Regulation.
 (3)  "Department" means the Texas Department of
 Licensing and Regulation.
 (4)  "Executive director" means the executive director
 of the department.
 (5)  "Youth sports program" means an organized
 competitive sports program that:
 (A)  provides instruction for an Olympic or
 University Interscholastic League sponsored or sanctioned sport;
 (B)  is not associated with a school; and
 (C)  instructs children who are enrolled in
 kindergarten through 12th grade in a public, private, or charter
 school or children of similar age who are provided an education in a
 home setting.
 SUBCHAPTER B. YOUTH SPORTS PROGRAM ADVISORY BOARD
 Sec. 2053.051.  YOUTH SPORTS PROGRAM ADVISORY BOARD. (a)
 The youth sports program advisory board consists of nine members
 appointed by the presiding officer of the commission with the
 approval of the commission, as follows:
 (1)  two members who are physicians licensed in this
 state specializing in orthopedic surgery and sports medicine;
 (2)  two members who are physicians licensed in this
 state specializing in neurology;
 (3)  one member who is a psychologist licensed in this
 state specializing in youth psychology;
 (4)  one member who is the current or former chief law
 enforcement officer of a county or municipality; and
 (5)  three members who represent the public.
 (b)  Appointments to the advisory board shall be made without
 regard to the race, color, disability, sex, religion, age, or
 national origin of the appointee.
 Sec. 2053.052.  TERMS. Members of the advisory board serve
 staggered six-year terms, with the terms of three members expiring
 January 31 of each odd-numbered year.
 Sec. 2053.053.  VACANCY. If a vacancy occurs during a term
 of a member of the advisory board, the presiding officer of the
 commission, with the commission's approval, shall appoint a
 replacement who meets the qualifications for the vacant position to
 serve for the remainder of the term.
 Sec. 2053.054.  PRESIDING OFFICER. (a)  The presiding
 officer of the commission shall designate a member of the advisory
 board to serve as the presiding officer of the advisory board for a
 term of two years.
 (b)  The presiding officer of the advisory board may vote on
 any matter before the advisory board.
 Sec. 2053.055.  DUTIES OF ADVISORY BOARD. The advisory
 board shall provide advice and recommendations to the department on
 technical matters relevant to the administration of this chapter.
 SUBCHAPTER C. POWERS AND DUTIES OF COMMISSION AND DEPARTMENT
 Sec. 2053.101.  GENERAL POWERS AND DUTIES. The department
 shall:
 (1)  administer and enforce this chapter;
 (2)  evaluate the qualifications of license
 applicants;
 (3)  issue licenses;
 (4)  in connection with a hearing under this chapter,
 issue subpoenas, examine witnesses, and administer oaths under the
 laws of this state; and
 (5)  investigate persons engaging in practices that
 violate this chapter.
 Sec. 2053.102.  RULES. The commission shall adopt rules
 consistent with this chapter for the administration and enforcement
 of this chapter.
 Sec. 2053.103.  FEES. The commission by rule shall set fees
 in amounts reasonable and necessary to cover the costs of
 administering this chapter.
 Sec. 2053.104.  REPORT OF VIOLATIONS AND OTHER SAFETY
 CONCERNS. The department shall establish and maintain a toll-free
 telephone number for reporting suspected violations of this chapter
 or rules adopted under this chapter and other safety concerns.
 Sec. 2053.105.  EVALUATION OF CONCUSSION PROTOCOL. (a)  The
 department shall evaluate a concussion protocol a youth sports
 program submits for the department's approval as required by
 Section 2053.202.
 (b)  The commission by rule shall establish criteria for the
 approval of a concussion protocol under this section.
 Sec. 2053.106.  EVALUATION OF VENUE SAFETY PROTOCOL. (a)
 The department shall evaluate a venue safety protocol a youth
 sports program submits for the department's approval as required by
 Section 2053.203.
 (b)  The commission by rule shall establish criteria for the
 approval of a venue safety protocol under this section.
 SUBCHAPTER D. LICENSE
 Sec. 2053.151.  LICENSE REQUIRED. A person may not operate a
 youth sports program unless the person holds a license issued in
 accordance with this chapter.
 Sec. 2053.152.  APPLICATION; FEE.  An applicant for a
 license under this chapter must:
 (1)  submit an application in the manner and on a form
 the department prescribes; and
 (2)  pay the application fee set by commission rule.
 Sec. 2053.153.  ELIGIBILITY. To be eligible for a license
 under this chapter, a license applicant must satisfy the
 eligibility requirements established by commission rule.
 Sec. 2053.154.  ISSUANCE. The commission shall issue a
 license to an applicant who the commission determines has satisfied
 the requirements of this chapter and commission rules.
 Sec. 2053.155.  TERM. A license issued under this chapter is
 valid for the term established by commission rule.
 Sec. 2053.156.  RENEWAL. A license issued under this
 chapter may be renewed as provided by commission rules.
 SUBCHAPTER E. OPERATION OF YOUTH SPORTS PROGRAMS
 Sec. 2053.201.  SAFETY TRAINING REQUIRED. An individual may
 not serve as a coach or trainer for a youth sports program unless
 the person successfully completes a safety training course
 substantially similar to the extracurricular activity safety
 training program developed and adopted by the University
 Interscholastic League under Section 33.202, Education Code.
 Sec. 2053.202.  CONCUSSION PROTOCOL REQUIRED. A person may
 not operate a youth sports program unless the person develops and
 implements for the program a concussion protocol approved by the
 department in accordance with Section 2053.105.
 Sec. 2053.203.  VENUE SAFETY PROTOCOL REQUIRED. A person
 may not operate a youth sports program unless the person develops
 and implements a venue safety protocol approved by the department
 in accordance with Section 2053.106 for the venue at which the
 program will operate.
 SUBCHAPTER F. DISCIPLINARY ACTIONS AND ENFORCEMENT PROCEDURES
 Sec. 2053.251.  DISCIPLINARY ACTION. In accordance with
 Section 51.353, the commission or executive director may deny,
 revoke, or suspend a license, refuse to renew a license, place on
 probation a person whose license has been suspended, or reprimand a
 license holder for a violation of this chapter, a rule adopted under
 this chapter, or an order of the commission or executive director.
 Sec. 2053.252.  ENFORCEMENT PROCEDURES. The commission,
 department, or executive director may enforce this chapter, a rule
 adopted under this chapter, or an order of the commission or
 executive director as provided by Subchapters F and G, Chapter 51.
 SECTION 2.  Not later than May 1, 2026, the Texas Commission
 of Licensing and Regulation shall adopt the rules, procedures, and
 fees necessary to administer Chapter 2053, Occupations Code, as
 added by this Act.
 SECTION 3.  (a) Not later than January 1, 2026, the presiding
 officer of the Texas Commission of Licensing and Regulation shall
 appoint members to the advisory board created under Section
 2053.051, Occupations Code, as added by this Act.
 (b)  Notwithstanding Section 2053.053, Occupations Code, as
 added by this Act, in making the initial appointments to the
 advisory board, the presiding officer of the commission shall
 designate three members to serve terms expiring January 31, 2027,
 three members to serve terms expiring January 31, 2029, and three
 members to serve terms expiring January 31, 2031.
 SECTION 4.  (a) Except as provided by Subsection (b) of this
 section, this Act takes effect September 1, 2025.
 (b)  Section 2053.151, Occupations Code, as added by this
 Act, and Subchapter F, Chapter 2053, Occupations Code, as added by
 this Act, take effect September 1, 2026.