Senate | 05/01/2025 | Referred to State Affairs | ||
Senate | 05/01/2025 | Read first time | ||
Senate | 04/30/2025 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1663 | |
House | 04/30/2025 | Reported engrossed | ||
House | 04/30/2025 | Record vote | RV#1000 | |
House | 04/30/2025 | Passed | ||
House | 04/30/2025 | Read 3rd time | ||
House | 04/29/2025 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2187 | |
House | 04/29/2025 | Record vote | RV#853 | Journal Page: 2187 |
House | 04/29/2025 | Passed to engrossment as amended | ||
House | 04/29/2025 | Record vote RV#853 | ||
House | 04/29/2025 | Amended | 1-Moody | Journal Page: 2181 |
House | 04/29/2025 | Amended 1-Moody | ||
House | 04/29/2025 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2186 | |
House | 04/29/2025 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/24/2025 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/03/2025 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/03/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/03/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1041 | |
House | 03/26/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/26/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/19/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/19/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/19/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/19/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/05/2025 | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 413 | |
House | 03/05/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 413 | |
House | 11/12/2024 | Filed |