LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2025 - 89th Regular
House
Bills
HB954
Meeting Schedule
TX
Texas House Bill HB954
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2025 - 89th Regular
Texas House Bill HB954
Meeting Schedule
Calendar
Date
Event
Location
03/13/2025
8:00 am
Land & Resource Management Committee Meeting - Video Transcripts, Minutes, and Details
E2.026
HB23
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S Received from the House
HB363
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/29/2025 S Referred to Local Government
HB447
Introduced
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
HB954
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/17/2025 H Considered in Calendars