House | 05/06/2025 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/06/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/06/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 04/30/2025 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/30/2025 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/30/2025 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/30/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/30/2025 | Recalled from subcommittee | ||
House | 04/14/2025 | Left pending in subcommittee | ||
House | 04/14/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee | ||
House | 04/14/2025 | Committee substitute considered in s/c | ||
House | 04/14/2025 | Considered by s/c in public hearing | ||
House | 04/14/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . | ||
House | 03/19/2025 | Referred to s/c on International Relations by Speaker | Journal Page: 677 | |
House | 03/12/2025 | Filed |