Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas House Bill HCR144 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 05/06/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            89R28665 HMR-D
 By: Cortez H.C.R. No. 144




 CONCURRENT RESOLUTION
 WHEREAS, On Memorial Day each May, citizens across our state
 and nation come together for a day of solemn remembrance of those
 military service members who have given their lives in the line of
 duty; and
 WHEREAS, On May 24, 2025, the Fallen Heroes Memorial Service
 will take place in the House chamber at the Texas Capitol for the
 purpose of honoring all members of the U.S. military killed in
 action and paying special tribute to those from Texas who made the
 ultimate sacrifice for our country; and
 WHEREAS, This roll of honor includes U.S. Army Staff Sergeant
 Felix A. Berrios, who died on November 3, 2023, Navy SEAL Special
 Warfare Operator 2nd Class Nathan G. Ingram, who was lost at sea on
 January 12, 2024, and U.S. Marine Corps Major Tobin Lewis, who
 perished in an aircraft crash on August 27, 2023; and
 WHEREAS, These brave men exemplified the highest ideals of
 the United States armed forces, inspiring others with their
 fortitude, tenacity, and courage, and they are indeed deserving of
 the lasting gratitude of their fellow Americans; now, therefore, be
 it
 RESOLVED, That the 89th Legislature of the State of Texas
 hereby pay tribute to the lives of U.S. Army Staff Sergeant
 Felix A. Berrios, Navy SEAL Special Warfare Operator 2nd Class
 Nathan G. Ingram, and U.S. Marine Corps Major Tobin Lewis as part of
 the 2025 Fallen Heroes Memorial Service and extend sincere sympathy
 to all those who mourn their passing; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for the family of each service member and that when the
 Texas House of Representatives and Senate adjourn this day, they do
 so in memory of these fallen heroes.