E | 02/19/2025 | Filed with the Secretary of State | Journal Page: 280 | |
Senate | 02/19/2025 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 272 | |
House | 02/18/2025 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 253 | |
House | 02/13/2025 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 254 | |
House | 02/13/2025 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 247 | |
Senate | 02/12/2025 | Record vote | Journal Page: 233 | |
Senate | 02/12/2025 | Adopted | Journal Page: 233 | |
Senate | 02/12/2025 | Read | Journal Page: 233 | |
Senate | 02/12/2025 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 232 | |
Senate | 02/12/2025 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 230 | |
House | 02/11/2025 | Record vote | ||
House | 02/11/2025 | Adopted | Journal Page: 224 | |
House | 02/11/2025 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 224 | |
House | 02/11/2025 | Filed |