House | 04/29/2025 | Laid on the table subject to call | Journal Page: 2261 | |
House | 04/29/2025 | Companion considered in lieu of | SCR 13 | Journal Page: 2260 |
House | 04/29/2025 | Placed on Resolutions Calendar | ||
House | 04/24/2025 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/11/2025 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/10/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/10/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1381 | |
House | 04/07/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/07/2025 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/07/2025 | Recalled from subcommittee | ||
House | 03/27/2025 | Left pending in subcommittee | ||
House | 03/27/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee | ||
House | 03/27/2025 | Considered by s/c in public hearing | ||
House | 03/27/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . | ||
House | 03/05/2025 | Referred to s/c on State-Federal Relations by Speaker | Journal Page: 418 | |
House | 02/19/2025 | Filed |