House | 05/10/2025 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/10/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/10/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 05/08/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/08/2025 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 05/08/2025 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/01/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 05/01/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 05/01/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/01/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/05/2025 | Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism | Journal Page: 419 | |
House | 02/24/2025 | Filed |