LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2025 - 89th Regular
House
Bills
HCR9
Meeting Schedule
TX
Texas House Bill HCR9
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2025 - 89th Regular
Texas House Bill HCR9
Meeting Schedule
Calendar
Date
Event
Location
04/02/2025
8:00 am
Trade, Workforce & Economic Development Committee Meeting - Video Transcripts, Minutes, and Details
E2.014
HB112
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
HB199
Introduced
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
HB621
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S Received from the House
HB1349
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Laid on the table subject to call
HB2214
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Postponed
HB3466
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
HB3698
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
HB3699
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
HCR9
Introduced
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Committee report distributed: May 2 2025 3:55PM