House | 05/07/2025 | Record vote | RV#1743 | |
House | 05/07/2025 | Adopted | ||
House | 05/07/2025 | Laid before the House | ||
House | 05/02/2025 | Placed on Resolutions Calendar | ||
House | 04/30/2025 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/28/2025 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/25/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/25/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2042 | |
House | 04/02/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/02/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/02/2025 | Recalled from subcommittee | ||
House | 03/24/2025 | Left pending in subcommittee | ||
House | 03/24/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee | ||
House | 03/24/2025 | Considered by s/c in public hearing | ||
House | 03/24/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . | ||
House | 03/05/2025 | Referred to s/c on Defense & Veterans' Affairs by Speaker | Journal Page: 419 | |
House | 02/28/2025 | Filed |