Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Last Action: 04/23/2025 H Left pending in committee
Last Action: 04/25/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
Last Action: 04/24/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Recommitted to committee: May 2 2025 9:34AM
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
Last Action: 04/23/2025 H Left pending in committee
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Last Action: 04/23/2025 H Left pending in committee
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars