Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas House Bill HJR78 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 11/12/2024

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            89R2076 CJC-F
 By: Raymond H.J.R. No. 78




 A JOINT RESOLUTION
 proposing a constitutional amendment prohibiting the taxation of
 the sale or use of certain food, drinks, medicine, and child-care
 services.
 BE IT RESOLVED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Article VIII, Texas Constitution, is amended by
 adding Section 28 to read as follows:
 Sec. 28.  The legislature may not enact a general law that
 would impose a state tax on the sale or use of:
 (1)  food or a drink that was not subject to taxation
 under Chapter 151, Tax Code, on January 1, 2025;
 (2)  a medicine that was not subject to taxation under
 Chapter 151, Tax Code, on January 1, 2025; or
 (3)  a child-care service that was not subject to
 taxation under Chapter 151, Tax Code, on January 1, 2025.
 SECTION 2.  The following temporary provision is added to
 the Texas Constitution:
 TEMPORARY PROVISION. (a) This temporary provision applies
 to the constitutional amendment proposed by the 89th Legislature,
 Regular Session, 2025, prohibiting the taxation of the sale or use
 of certain food, drinks, medicine, and child-care services, and
 expires December 31, 2027.
 (b)  If the 89th Legislature, during the regular or a special
 session, enacts a general law prohibited by Section 28, Article
 VIII, of this constitution, the portion of the general law that
 violates that section expires January 1, 2027.
 SECTION 3.  This proposed constitutional amendment shall be
 submitted to the voters at an election to be held November 4, 2025.
 The ballot shall be printed to permit voting for or against the
 proposition: "The constitutional amendment prohibiting the
 taxation of the sale or use of certain food, drinks, medicine, and
 child-care services."