Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas House Bill HR468 Compare Versions

Only one version of the bill is available at this time.
OldNewDifferences
11 By: Meza H.R. No. 468
22
33
44
55
66 R E S O L U T I O N
77 WHEREAS, Since the ratification of the Constitution of the
88 United States on June 21, 1788, the Congress of the United States
99 has had the power "To exercise exclusive Legislation in all Cases
1010 whatsoever, over such District (not exceeding ten Miles square) as
1111 may, by Cession of particular States, and the Acceptance of
1212 Congress, become the Seat of the Government of the United States;"
1313 and
1414 WHEREAS, The Seat of the Government of the United States was
1515 accepted by the Congress of the United States on July 16, 1790 and
1616 transferred from the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania to the District
1717 on December 1, 1800 in accordance with the Residence Act of 1790,
1818 and was organized into the District of Columbia under the entire
1919 control of the Congress of the United States for every purpose of
2020 Government on February 27, 1801 in accordance with the District of
2121 Columbia Organic Act of 1801, through which the residents ceased to
2222 be considered citizens of a state, no longer entitled to all the
2323 rights, guaranties, and immunities of the Constitution of the
2424 United States including, but not limited to: the right to appoint at
2525 least three Electors in the Electoral College for President and
2626 Vice President of the United States, the right to elect two Senators
2727 and at least one Representative in the Congress of the United
2828 States, and the right to self-govern and ratify proposed amendments
2929 to the Constitution of the United States, despite continuing to pay
3030 federal taxes, serve in the military, and share all other
3131 responsibilities of citizenship of the United States; and
3232 WHEREAS, A Twenty-Third Amendment to the Constitution of the
3333 United States was proposed by the Congress of the United States on
3434 June 16, 1960 and ratified by a sufficient number of states on March
3535 29, 1961 granting "The District constituting the seat of Government
3636 of the United States" the right to appoint "A number of electors of
3737 President and Vice President equal to the whole number of Senators
3838 and Representatives in Congress to which the District would be
3939 entitled if it were a State, but in no event more than the least
4040 populous State;" and
4141 WHEREAS, The Congress of the United States granted a Delegate
4242 to the House of Representatives from the District of Columbia, who
4343 "shall have a seat in the House of Representatives, with the right
4444 of debate, but not of voting," on September 22, 1970 in accordance
4545 with the District of Columbia Delegate Act, (after previously
4646 establishing the position on February 21, 1871 and repealing the
4747 position on June 20, 1874); and
4848 WHEREAS, Enactment of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act
4949 by the Congress of the United States on December 24, 1973 and
5050 ratification of the Charter Referendum by a majority of the voters
5151 of the District of Columbia on May 7, 1974, re-organized the
5252 District of Columbia by granting limited powers of local
5353 self-government to an elected thirteen-member Council of the
5454 District of Columbia and an elected Mayor of the District of
5555 Columbia to "relieve Congress of the burden of legislating upon
5656 essentially local District matters;" however, the Congress of the
5757 United States granted no local control over the judiciary and
5858 reserved "the right, at any time, to exercise its constitutional
5959 authority as legislature for the District, by enacting legislation
6060 for the District on any subject, whether within or without the scope
6161 of legislative power granted to the Council... including
6262 legislation to amend or repeal any law in force in the District;"
6363 and
6464 WHEREAS, Historically, the Congress of the United States and
6565 the President of the United States have interfered with the
6666 District of Columbia's local self-government and Home Rule by
6767 enacting resolutions disapproving, amending, and repealing actions
6868 of the Council of the District of Columbia and the Mayor of the
6969 District of Columbia - including cases concerning the location of
7070 chanceries on December 20, 1979, sexual assault reform on October
7171 1, 1981, schedule of heights on March 12, 1991, and a revised
7272 criminal code on March 20, 2023 - and by imposing budget riders that
7373 control and limit the use of locally-raised tax revenue - including
7474 cases concerning reproductive health services, cannabis use, and
7575 statehood advocacy; and
7676 WHEREAS, On multiple occasions, a majority of the voters of
7777 the District of Columbia have approved initiatives and referendums
7878 expressing their desire for statehood, most recently on November 8,
7979 2016, through which 85.69% of voters 1) agreed that the District
8080 should be admitted to the union as the State of Washington, D.C., 2)
8181 approved the Constitution of the State of Washington, D.C., 3)
8282 approved the proposed boundaries between the State of Washington,
8383 D.C. and the federal enclave, and 4) agreed that the State of
8484 Washington, D.C. shall guarantee an elected representative form of
8585 government; and
8686 WHEREAS, Other state and territorial legislatures in the
8787 United States have introduced, debated, and passed resolutions that
8888 support admitting Washington, D.C. into the Union as a state of the
8989 United States of America; and
9090 WHEREAS, Despite the Constitution of the United States
9191 establishing that "New States may be admitted by the Congress into
9292 this Union," and despite the United States House of Representatives
9393 passing the Washington, D.C. Admission Act on June 26, 2020 and
9494 again on April 22, 2021, which would declare Washington, D.C. to be
9595 "a State of the United States of America, and is declared admitted
9696 into the Union on an equal footing with the other States in all
9797 respects whatever," the Congress of the United States has yet to
9898 grant full statehood to the approximately 700,000 people of
9999 Washington, D.C.; now, therefore, be it
100100 RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 89th Texas
101101 Legislature hereby support admitting Washington, D.C. into the
102102 Union as a state of the United States of America; and, be it further
103103 RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 89th Texas
104104 Legislature hereby oppose efforts by the Congress of the United
105105 States and the President of the United States that interfere with
106106 local self-government and Home Rule - including federal laws
107107 disapproving, amending, and repealing actions of the Council of the
108108 District of Columbia and the Mayor of the District of Columbia as
109109 well as federal budget riders that control and limit the use of
110110 locally-raised tax revenue - and calls on the Congress of the United
111111 States and the President of the United States to enact federal
112112 legislation granting statehood to the people of Washington, D.C.;
113113 and, be it further
114114 RESOLVED, That copies of this resolution be sent to the
115115 President of the United States, the Vice President of the United
116116 States in their capacity as President of the United States Senate,
117117 the Speaker of the United States House of Representatives, and the
118118 members of the Texas congressional delegation.