Last Action: 04/24/2025 S Referred to Business & Commerce
Last Action: 04/24/2025 S Received from the House
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Laid on the table subject to call
Last Action: 03/26/2025 H Failed to receive affirmative vote in comm.
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S Received from the House
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Reported engrossed: May 1 2025 2:57PM
Last Action: 05/01/2025 S Left pending in committee
Last Action: 05/01/2025 S Referred to Business & Commerce
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Laid on the table subject to call
Last Action: 04/22/2025 H Postponed
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S Referred to Business & Commerce
Last Action: 04/16/2025 S Referred to Water, Agriculture, & Rural Affairs
Last Action: 04/29/2025 S Referred to Business & Commerce
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Considered in Calendars