Texas 2025 89th Regular

Texas House Bill HR546 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 04/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    H.R. No. 546




 R E S O L U T I O N
 WHEREAS, A rich and purposeful life drew to a close with the
 passing of Mary Burney McMahon Markham on September 2, 2023, at the
 age of 83; and
 WHEREAS, The former Mary McMahon was born in Fort Worth on
 August 16, 1940, to Frieda Taliaferro McMahon and Robert McMahon;
 she was raised with her siblings, Frieda and Marshall, in Tarrant
 County, spending time at the family farm near White Settlement, in
 Arlington, and in Fort Worth, where she graduated from Paschal High
 School in 1958; she studied at Texas Tech University and Texas
 Christian University before finishing her bachelor's degree in
 education at North Texas State University, and she went on to
 distinguish herself in her work as an elementary school teacher;
 and
 WHEREAS, She wed David Markham on June 3, 1961, and they
 shared a rewarding marriage that spanned more than six decades
 before his passing in 2022; the couple became the parents of a
 daughter, Meribeth, and a son, Steven, and the family settled in
 Dallas in 1972; through the years, Mrs. Markham devoted herself to
 caring for her husband and children and later became the beloved
 "Mermer" to six grandchildren; her generosity and thoughtfulness
 made the Markham home a welcoming destination for a wide circle of
 family and friends; and
 WHEREAS, Mrs. Markham was a member of St. John's Episcopal
 Church in Dallas, where she served on the altar guild; an avid
 traveler, she had the opportunity to visit locations around the
 globe while accompanying her husband on business trips; and
 WHEREAS, Although Mary Markham will be greatly missed, she
 has left her loved ones with a wealth of memories that they will
 forever cherish; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 89th Texas
 Legislature hereby pay tribute to the life of Mary Burney McMahon
 Markham and extend sincere sympathy to the members of her family: to
 her children, Meribeth Wilkinson and her husband, Rick, and Steven
 Markham and his wife, Sabine; to her grandchildren; to her sister,
 Frieda Thomas; to her brother, Dr. Marshall McMahon; and to her
 other relatives and friends; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for her family and that when the Texas House of
 Representatives adjourns this day, it do so in memory of Mary
 Markham.
 Meyer
 ______________________________
 Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.R. No. 546 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the House on March 31, 2025.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House