Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas House Bill HR891 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 04/24/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            H.R. No. 891




 R E S O L U T I O N
 WHEREAS, Edna Belle Pemberton passed away on April 13, 2025,
 at the age of 81, leaving her family, friends, and neighbors to
 reflect on her remarkable life and her many years of dedicated
 service to Dallas's Oak Cliff community; and
 WHEREAS, Born in Chicago, Illinois, on March 27, 1944, Edna
 Pemberton grew up as the youngest of nine children; she married the
 love of her life, DarNell Pemberton, on September 19, 1964, and
 together, they raised four daughters, Edna Jean, Rita, Lisa, and
 Myra; the couple later relocated to Richmond, California, and
 adopted eight nieces and nephews, becoming a family of 14; and
 WHEREAS, Mrs. Pemberton was employed as a manager at Kmart,
 and she continued her career with the company after moving with her
 family to Dallas, where she made her home in the Oak Cliff
 neighborhood and became highly involved in civic life; through
 Kmart, she initiated a number of school supply programs; she also
 advocated for her employees by collaborating with the City of
 Dallas and DART to establish Route 66, a bus line serving residents
 of Oak Cliff; and
 WHEREAS, Over the years, Mrs. Pemberton benefited numerous
 people by organizing clothing giveaways for flood survivors,
 establishing a citywide homeless program called Bridge Over
 Troubled Water alongside her husband, and successfully campaigning
 for a juvenile curfew ordinance to keep youth off the streets and
 away from criminal activities; she was an active supporter of
 several youth programs at Concord Church, and in the aftermath of
 Hurricane Katrina in 2005, she organized members of her church and
 coordinated with various agencies to help provide relief to
 evacuees; in recognition of her efforts, FEMA offered her a job as a
 volunteer liaison and credited her with aiding approximately 84,000
 people, many of whom subsequently relocated to Dallas; and
 WHEREAS, Mrs. Pemberton found time to serve other
 organizations as well, among them Friends of Red Bird Airport, Camp
 Wisdom Now, Operation Community Care, and Parkland Hospital; she
 also held membership on the boards of the Martin Luther King Center
 in South Dallas and the Dallas NAACP, which named a community award
 in honor of her and her husband; together with Mr. Pemberton, she
 established the group Positively Oak Cliff to help strengthen the
 local economy and introduce valuable initiatives such as an
 aviation education program for young teens at Red Bird Airport and
 youth etiquette programs at Red Bird Mall; and
 WHEREAS, In the later years of her life, Mrs. Pemberton was
 deeply invested in maintaining and revitalizing Red Bird Mall, and
 she was appointed by Mayor Tom Leppert to act as a liaison between
 the mall's tenants and the City of Dallas as community officials
 sought to save it from closure; she further volunteered her time as
 a voter registrar and precinct chair, and in addition to receiving
 several governor's awards, she had the distinction of carrying the
 Olympic torch through Dallas in 1996; and
 WHEREAS, Edna Pemberton was a woman of great compassion and
 generosity who dedicated much of her life to serving the needs of
 her community, and although she will be profoundly missed, her
 legacy will live on in the hearts of the countless people touched by
 her many good works; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 89th Texas
 Legislature hereby pay tribute to the memory of Edna Belle
 Pemberton and extend sincere sympathy to all those who mourn her
 passing; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for her family and that when the Texas House of
 Representatives adjourns this day, it do so in memory of Edna
 Pemberton.
 Y. Davis of Dallas
 ______________________________
 Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.R. No. 891 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the House on April 24, 2025.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House