Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas House Bill HR9 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 11/12/2024

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            89R1797 CW-D
 By: Morales of Harris H.R. No. 9




 R E S O L U T I O N
 WHEREAS, May 5, 2025, marks the 48th anniversary of the
 tragic death of Joe Campos Torres, a 23-year-old military veteran
 who was brutally killed by Houston police officers; and
 WHEREAS, The son of Joe Luna Torres and Margaret Campos
 Torres, Joe Torres was born in Houston on December 20, 1953;
 answering his nation's call to duty, he joined the U.S. Army in 1974
 and served in the Vietnam War; upon the completion of his military
 tenure in 1976, he returned home and began working for the Houston
 Sash & Door Company; and
 WHEREAS, On the fateful day of May 5, 1977, Mr. Torres was
 arrested after an altercation at a local bar; rather than taking him
 to the city jail, police officers transported Mr. Torres to a
 secret location along Buffalo Bayou where he was severely beaten;
 ultimately, he was pushed into the bayou, where he drowned; and
 WHEREAS, The murder of Mr. Torres galvanized the Mexican
 American community, igniting a lengthy period of protest marked by
 marches and rallies throughout the city; activists came together to
 form multiracial and multigenerational civil rights coalitions,
 and such entities as Barrios Unidos en Defensa, the League of United
 Latin American Citizens, the American G.I. Forum, and the Mexican
 American Legal Defense and Educational Fund lent their support to
 the cause; and
 WHEREAS, In June 2021, the Houston Police Department issued a
 formal apology to the Torres family and promised that a monument
 would be erected in Mr. Torres's honor; on April 2, 2022, the City
 of Houston held a dedication ceremony for the Joe Campos Torres
 Plaza in downtown Houston; and
 WHEREAS, Although nearly five decades have passed since the
 senseless death of Joe Torres, this heartbreaking tragedy continues
 to resonate throughout the community of Houston and beyond, and
 civil rights advocates and Mr. Torres's family remain committed to
 the fight against racial discrimination and injustice; now,
 therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 89th Texas
 Legislature hereby pay tribute to the life and service of Joe Campos
 Torres on the 48th anniversary of his death.