Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas House Bill HR951

Caption

In memory of Harold James Hardcastle of Vernon.

Impact

The resolution emphasizes Mr. Hardcastle's engagement in local organizations and leadership roles, such as his presidency in the National and Texas Agricultural Aviation Associations, showcasing his influence in agricultural practices and community service. This acknowledgment serves not only to commemorate his achievements but also highlights the broader impact individuals can have within their communities. The commitment of Mr. Hardcastle to serve in various capacities illustrates a life dedicated to the betterment of those around him.

Summary

House Resolution 951 (HR951) is a memorial resolution that honors the life and legacy of Harold James Hardcastle of Vernon, Texas, who passed away on April 9, 2025, at the age of 93. The resolution outlines Mr. Hardcastle's significant contributions to both his family and community throughout his lifetime. It reflects on his personal history, including his education, military service, as well as his professional endeavors in agricultural aviation and cattle ranching.

Contention

While memorial resolutions like HR951 typically do not encounter opposition or contention, they can sometimes prompt discussions about the societal values represented by the individual being honored. In this case, the emphasis on family values, community service, and veteran recognition underscores the importance of such contributions to society. HR951 serves as a reminder of the legacy left by individuals who have dedicated their lives to both their families and their communities, reinforcing these ideals in public discourse and legislative actions.

Companion Bills

No companion bills found.

Similar Bills

TX HR288

Recognizing March 3, 2011, as Texas Federation of Republican Women Day at the Capitol.

TX HCR35

Recognizing February 1, 2011, as Texas Tech University System Day.

TX HCR126

In memory of the Honorable Edmund Kuempel of Seguin.

TX HR67

Honoring Dr. T. David Greer, Physician of the Day for January 15, 2009, for his professional achievements.

TX HR499

Recognizing February 22, 2011, as Texas FFA Day at the State Capitol.

TX HR412

Recognizing February 15, 2011, as Texas Farm Bureau District 1 Day at the State Capitol.

TX HR500

In memory of Texas Department of Public Safety Senior Corporal David Ralph Slaton of Bowie.

TX HR1506

Recognizing the Texas A&M University Agricultural and Natural Resources Policy Internship Program and Public Policy Internship Program and the interns for the 82nd legislative session.