House | 05/05/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/05/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/30/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/30/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/30/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/30/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/22/2025 | Referred to Corrections | Journal Page: 1641 | |
House | 04/22/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1641 | |
House | 04/02/2025 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 909 | |
Senate | 04/01/2025 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 848 | |
Senate | 04/01/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 822 | |
Senate | 04/01/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 822 | |
Senate | 04/01/2025 | Record vote | Journal Page: 822 | |
Senate | 04/01/2025 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 822 | |
Senate | 04/01/2025 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 822 | |
Senate | 04/01/2025 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 822 | |
Senate | 04/01/2025 | Amended | Journal Page: 822 | |
Senate | 04/01/2025 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 Perry | Journal Page: 822 |
Senate | 04/01/2025 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 821 | |
Senate | 04/01/2025 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 821 | |
Senate | 03/27/2025 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/19/2025 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/19/2025 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/19/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 640 | |
Senate | 03/18/2025 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/18/2025 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/18/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/18/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/24/2025 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 301 | |
Senate | 02/24/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 301 | |
Senate | 01/30/2025 | Filed | ||
Senate | 01/30/2025 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |