Senate
|
05/06/2025
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2025
|
House passage reported
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2025
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2025
|
Record vote
|
RV#1480
|
|
House
|
05/06/2025
|
Passed
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2025
|
Record vote RV#1480
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2025
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2025
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2025
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2774
|
House
|
05/05/2025
|
Laid out in lieu of companion
|
CSHB 4115
|
Journal Page: 2774
|
House
|
05/02/2025
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2025
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2025
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2755
|
House
|
04/30/2025
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2025
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2025
|
Referred to Trade, Workforce & Economic Development
|
|
Journal Page: 1576
|
House
|
04/17/2025
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1588
|
House
|
04/14/2025
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1370
|
Senate
|
04/10/2025
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2025
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1057
|
Senate
|
04/10/2025
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1057
|
Senate
|
04/10/2025
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1057
|
Senate
|
04/10/2025
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1057
|
Senate
|
04/10/2025
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1057
|
Senate
|
04/10/2025
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1057
|
Senate
|
04/10/2025
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1057
|
Senate
|
04/10/2025
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Johnson
|
Journal Page: 1056
|
Senate
|
04/10/2025
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1056
|
Senate
|
04/10/2025
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2025
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2025
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2025
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2025
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2025
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2025
|
Vote taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2025
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2025
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2025
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2025
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2025
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2025
|
Referred to Business & Commerce
|
|
Journal Page: 304
|
Senate
|
02/24/2025
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 304
|
Senate
|
02/03/2025
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2025
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|