House | 05/02/2025 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 2751 | |
House | 05/02/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2751 | |
House | 05/01/2025 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2640 | |
Senate | 04/30/2025 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1686 | |
Senate | 04/30/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 1678 | |
Senate | 04/30/2025 | Read 3rd time | ||
Senate | 04/30/2025 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1678 | |
Senate | 04/30/2025 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1678 | |
Senate | 04/30/2025 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | ||
Senate | 04/30/2025 | Co-author authorized | ||
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/15/2025 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/15/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1308 | |
Senate | 04/14/2025 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/14/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/24/2025 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 305 | |
Senate | 02/24/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 305 | |
Senate | 02/03/2025 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/03/2025 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |